This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:26 (UTC).

CLARK VS BAKERSFIELD CONDORS, A PROFESSIONAL HOCKEY TEAM ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 CLARK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD CONDORS, A PROFESSIONAL HOCKEY TEAM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0609

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, PATRICIA

Defendants

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

JOHN DOE MANAGER OF BAKERSFIELD CONDORS

JOHN DOE STADIUM DESIGNERS AND ENGINEERS

OILERS ENTERTAINMENT GROUP

KG U.S. HOCKEY CORPORATION

KATZ OWNER AND CEO OF KATZ GROUP OF COMPANIES

KATZ, DARRYL

OILER ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC.

BAKERSFIELD CONDORS, A PROFESSIONAL HOCKEY TEAM

KG US OILERS CORP

AMERICAN HOCKEY LEAGUE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 06/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 06/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER "C"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketRequest For Hearing About Court Fees (FW-006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER; MISSING FORM FW-007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: DENIED BY JUDGE **CLARK** AS TO PATRICIA CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.