This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:58:11 (UTC).

CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC VS HERRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0109

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

HERRIGUEZ, YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, RONALD S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 801 Schipper Street, Unit #58 Arvin, CA 93203; Awarded Against: HERRIGUEZ, YOLANDA; Party: Names: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; HERRIGUEZ, YOLANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to Does 1 through 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Yolanda Herriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to All Unkown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Yolanda Herriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 801 SCHIPPER STREET, UNIT#58 ARVIN, CA 93203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less