This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:45:30 (UTC).

CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC VS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Oglesby, John D., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0060

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Oglesby, John D.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, RONALD S

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Tony Gutierrez; Parties Present Plaintiff: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S; Defendant: GUTIERREZ, TONY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Oglesby, John D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 801 Schipper Street, Unit #53 Arvin, CA 93203; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: GUTIERREZ, TONY; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,300.00; Holdover Damages: $1,126.84; Costs: $365.00; Total: $2,791.84; Party: Names: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; GUTIERREZ, TONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed by Tony Gutierrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: Date:10/22/15 At: 1:30PM Dept: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to All Persons Claiming a right to Occupancy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CITYWIDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 801 SCHIPPER STEET, UNIT#53 ARVIN, CA 93203 KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less