This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:36 (UTC).

CITY OF MCFARLAND, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CITY OF MCFARLAND, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2601

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF MCFARLAND, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendant

COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff

COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendant

STOCKBRIDGE GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, MATTHEW H.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HATTI, AMAR M.

Cross Defendant Attorney

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

 

Court Documents

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings 02/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/10/19 Cross-Defendant, STOCKBRIDGE GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (CCP 438) ResID: 33890; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GREEN, MATTHEW H.; Defendant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

Ruling

Ruling 01/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order 01/09/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Contest

Motion to Contest 10/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/25/18 Defendant, COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC Motion Contesting Application for Good Faith Settlement ResID: 33044; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GREEN, MATTHEW H.; Defendant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation rejected in File and Serve. Second Rejection

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Order rejected in File and Serve

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 04/11/2018; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GREEN, MATTHEW H.; Defendant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GREEN, MATTHEW H.; Defendant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.

Ruling

Ruling 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 07/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: fees posted by both; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GREEN, MATTHEW H.; Defendant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

Demurrer

Demurrer 05/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/17/19 Cross-Defendant, STOCKBRIDGE GENERAL CONTRACTING, INC. Demurrer to the First Amended Cross-Complaint of Community Works design Group, LLC ResID: 34664; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GREEN, MATTHEW H.; Defendant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HATTI, AMAR M.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

Ruling

Ruling 04/11/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Continued from 04/27/2020 by Standing Order; pursuant to CRC 3.1385 as to Complaint and Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: FCMC & JT 3/16/19; TE 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 02/20/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the insurance company representative of Defendant and Cross-Complainant, COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC, in the above-captioned matter, is excused from personal appearance at the Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for February 21, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the insurance company representative of Defendant and Cross-Complainant, COMMUNITY WORKS DESIGN GROUP, LLC, be available by telephone at the time set for the Mandatory Settlement Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action; Filed By: 12405; Filed Against: 12405

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action - Cross Action Cross-Complaint; File Date: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons as to Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY'S BIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Assignment / Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketReclassification - Transfer In

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.