This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 10:52:07 (UTC).

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD VS CHOI ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 CITY OF BAKERSFIELD filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CHOI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bradshaw, J. Eric and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1723

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

Defendants

ALL OTHER PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY

CHOI, HYEHYUN

RAN HYONG CHOI AKA TANYA R. CHOI

RAN HYONG CHOI AKA TANYA R. CHOI DBA JOLLY KONE

DONG K. CHOI AKA BRANDON D. CHOI

DONG K. CHOI AKA BRANDON D. CHOI DBA JOLLY KONE

RAN HYONG CHOI AKA TANYA R. CHOI INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA JOLLY KONE

DONG K. CHOI INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS JOLLY KONE

RAN HYONG CHOI INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS JOLLY KONE

DONG K. CHOI AKA BRANDON D. CHOI INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA JOLLY KONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GENNARO, VIRGINIA A

BLOCK, GLENN L

Defendant Attorney

FISHER, J JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT: MUST USE MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNSIL FORM.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/13/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:T2

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 12/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Filing date: 8/30/17 Filing party: City of Bakersfield FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLOCK, GLENN L

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: filing of Judgment / Final order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: AND FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Satisfaction of Judgment for Hyehyun Choi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL OTHER PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 TO 100 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Continued from 12/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Summary of the Basis (REAL ESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Notice of Deposit - Comment: Notice of Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in support of Motion for Prejudgment Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Re: FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION Hearing Date: 12/13/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: T-2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/13/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:T2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons and additional parties attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.