This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 16:57:14 (UTC).

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD VS 3MB, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 CITY OF BAKERSFIELD filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 3MB, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S., Friedman - Retired, Gary T., Lampe, David R., Bradshaw, J. Eric and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0121

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Lampe, David R.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAKERSFIELD

Defendants

ADALA N. STEINERT, TRUSTEE OF THE MARVIN E. STEINERT AND ADALA N. STEINERT LIVING TRUST OF 1978

3MB, LLC

KERN COUNTY LAND COMPANY

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

ALLIANCE TITLE COMPANY

PRUDENTIAL MORTGAGE CAPITAL COMPANY, LLC

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

MARVIN E. STEINERT, TRUSTEE OF THE MARVIN E. STEINERT AND ADALA N. STEINERT LIVING TRUST OF 1978

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELL, JEFFREY B.

HEGLUND, ANDREW M

Defendant Attorneys

MONJE, RICHARD A

HODGES, NATHAN M

GOLD, OLIVER M.

ALEGRIA, CESAR

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 05/01/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Set per 1/23/19 Order

Ruling

Ruling 12/21/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 1. Documents must be filed in lead case 2. Case number caption must follow CRC 3.350(d) 3. Number 2 is incorrectly marked.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 1. Documents must be filed in lead case 2. Case number caption must follow CRC 3.350(d) 3. Number 2 is incorrectly marked.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HODGES, NATHAN M

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation & Order does not have exhibit attached as stated in proposed order. Need to file together not as 2 separate documents.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: STIPULATION & ORDER

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: STIPULATION & ORDER:FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED FOR OTHER PARTIES LISTED ON STIPULATION.

Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: ***J. ERIC BRADSHAW*** DEPT T-2

Ruling

Ruling 03/02/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/07/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/29/2020: Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Further CMC set 2/7/2020

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation & Order: Since proposed order is on a separate pleading it needs to be filed separate from the stipulation not attached. MSC date must be precleared with the clerks office to assure the date is available, please call and preclear a date before resubmitting.

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 10/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 7/31/19

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 07/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 5-1-19; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BELL, JEFFREY B.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: Reasons: 1. Documents must be filed in the lead case, document filed in the consolidated case must include the case number of the lead case follwed by the case numbers of all of the other consolidated cases. 2. You must specify as to which case the defendant is being dismissed from. (1 request for dismissal can be submitted if you specify as to which party in what case is being dismissed.)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: Reasons: 1. All document filed in the consolidated case must include the case number of the lead case follwed by the case numbers of all of the other consolidated cases. 2. You must specify as to which case the defendant is being dismissed from. (1 request for dismissal can be submitted if you specify as to which party in what case is being dismissed.)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Continued CMC: Hearing is on July 31st not the 30th

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: cont'd from 9/28/2020 3MB, LLC filed B.K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketFinal Order of Condemnation - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The fee simple title to the property described in Exhibit A hereto is hereby condemned to the City for the public purposes stated in the complaint in this action. On filing a certified copy of this Final Order of Condemnation with the County Recorder of the County of Kern, State of California, the fee simple title to the real property described in Exhibit A shall vest in plaintiff, its successors, and its assigns. The Temporary Construction Easement described in Exhibit B hereto is hereby condemned to the City for the public purposes stated in the complaint in this action for the time period described in Exhibit B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Final Judgment in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Settlement and of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Order Approving Settlement; Request for Entry of Final Judgment and Final Order of Condemnation Pursuant to Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: for Entry of Final Judgment and Final Order of Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation; Judgment; Final Order; Notice of Settlement: If exempt from filing fees, please submit using a waiver account. If accepted, fees will be charged.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: con'td from 2/7/20 07/20/20 ***Continued from 04/10/2020 by Standing Order. *** MSC - Further set in May 2020 upon GFT's return

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Comment: Notice of Deposit of Probable Amount of Compensation-Action in Eminent Domain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Summary of Basis for Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Donald M. Anderson in Support of Motion for Order of Prejudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Prejudgment Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: ***J. ERIC BRADSHAW*** DEPT T-2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Served: 03/15/20183:10 PM; Served: 03/16/201811:02 AM; Served: 03/15/20182:37 PM; Served: 03/16/201811:02 AM; Unserved; Served: 03/26/20183:01 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3MB, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KERN COUNTY LAND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PRUDENTIAL MORTGAGE CAPITAL COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE TITLE COMPANY is a litigant