This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 19:03:54 (UTC).

CITIZEN V. BERRETH

Case Summary

On 06/14/2013 CITIZEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERRETH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9414

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK

Defendants

BERRETH, EDWARD E

EDWARD E. BERRETH LIMOUSINE SERVICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2013
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 237954. Receipt #738091 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketAmended Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketNP1835 - Comment: Department: B Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. TRIAL BY COURT. DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR THIS MINUTE ORDER AMENDED ON 08/08/2013 BY LETICIA RISENHOOVER TO CORRECT DEFENDANTS DBA THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MICHAEL L. MACDONALD (PL-1) APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK. EDWARD E BERRETH (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. JUDGMENT FOR CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK AGAINST EDWARD E. BERRETH DBA EDWARD E. BERRETH LIMOUSINE SERVICE FOR PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 COSTS $120.00. PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM IS FOR $6,460.47 - COURT ADVISED HIM THAT THE MAXIMUM AMOUNT THAT CAN BE CLAIMED IS $5,000.00 - PLAINTIFF WAIVES THE DIFFERENCE DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1:35 P.M..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketTable of Contents / Exhibits - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: Claim: $6460.47 Cost: $120.00 (Filing fee:$75.00 + Fee for Service:$45.00) Proof of Service: Defendant served by personal sevice on 6/19/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: Claim: $6460.47 Cost: $120.00 (Filing fee:$75.00 + Fee for Service:$45.00) Proof of Service: Defendant served by personal sevice on 6/19/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: Claim: $6460.47 Claim: $6460.47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Docket853F Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $5,000 but not - Comment: Amount of $75.00 for CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 237901. Receipt #722997 for amount of $75.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 556

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIZENS BUSINESS BANK is a litigant