This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:54 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE, INC. VS SECREST ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CITIMORTGAGE, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SECREST. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0699

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE, INC.

Defendants

SECREST, BRYAN

BATELAAN, EMILY

Inclusive, Does 1-10;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDONALD, WILLIAM F

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND OSC AND CMC: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/13/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND OSC AND CMC: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND OSC AND CMC: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/14/2017; Served: 04/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof Emily

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof Bryan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND OSC AND CMC: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/13/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: civil cover

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less