This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:37 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS RAMOS

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5769

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

RAMOS, MARTHA B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITTON, JAIME YOSHIMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Order on Settlement Agreement & Stipulation (JBSIS) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Stipulation - Comment: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Martha B Ramos. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less