This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 09:28:22 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS MEHL MRS

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEHL MRS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0494

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

MEHL MRS, CARMELITA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERRILL, DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CITIBANK, N.A.; Awarded Against: MEHL MRS, CARMELITA P; Amount; Damages: $3,902.47; Costs: $282.50; Total: $4184.97; Party: Name: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: CARMELITA P MEHL MRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: CARMELITA P MEHL MRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.