This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:17:28 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Gonzalez, Daniel R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McINTOSH, RYAN M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: declaration 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketStatement - Comment: STATEMENT OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: AS TO DANIEL R GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DANIEL R GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CITIBANK, N.A.; Served: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.