This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:30:12 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS FISCHER

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FISCHER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5084

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

FISCHER, MARTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD, ADAM L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Martha Fischer via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/19/20215:04 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD ADAM LEIGH