This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:59:45 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS EGETO

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EGETO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0423

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

EGETO, LAZLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN, DEVIN B.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: WRIT OF EXECUTION

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CITIBANK, N.A.; Awarded Against: EGETO, LAZLO; Amount; Damages: $7,699.58; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $284.50; Total: $7984.08; Party: Names: CITIBANK, N.A.; EGETO, LAZLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: interest and attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR LAZLO EGETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less