This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 03:52:38 (UTC).

CISNEROS RIOS VS RINCON(D)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 CISNEROS RIOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RINCON D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M. and Louie, Chad A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Louie, Chad A.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CISNEROS RIOS, M. GUADALUPE

CISNEROS RIOS, MARIA GUADALUPE

Respondent

RINCON, NOE JIMENEZ

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 3RD NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 2ND NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/28/20 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V REMOVE PERSONAL BELONGINGS *PET 1ST CONT FROM 2/13/20* 1 MINOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 3RD NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Comment: HRG 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 2ND NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Comment: CT DATE 03/05/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/28/20 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V REMOVE PERSONAL BELONGINGS *PET 1ST CONT FROM 2/13/20* 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: DV SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: HRG 3/5/2020 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: DV/TRO DIV D HRG 3/5/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: DV SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing) - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order Existing With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.