This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:00 (UTC).

CIG FINANCIAL, LC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS OSCAR G. MENDEZ AKA OSCAR G. MENDEZ, JR.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 CIG FINANCIAL, LC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OSCAR G MENDEZ AKA OSCAR G MENDEZ, JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIG FINANCIAL, LC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

OSCAR G. MENDEZ AKA OSCAR G. MENDEZ, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIFERS, JAMES S

KARAFILIS, STEPHANIE A N

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: CIG FINANCIAL, LC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; OSCAR G. MENDEZ AKA OSCAR G. MENDEZ, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: failure to comply with CRC Rule 3.740 Hearing Date: 5/4/2018 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: James S Sifers New Attorney: Stephanie A Newport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CIG FINANCIAL, LC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Served: 04/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.