Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:22 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A. AND SHIRLEY J. CUMMINGS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 1998 VS SIPLE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A AND SHIRLEY J CUMMINGS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 1998 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SIPLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0104

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A. AND SHIRLEY J. CUMMINGS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 1998

Defendants

SIPLE, DAVID L

SIPLE, DAVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESSY, FAWN KENNEDY

Defendant Attorney

ROSS, ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MO: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 08/06/15: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Court Transfer; Parties Present Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A. AND SHIRLEY J. CUMMINGS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 1998; Defendant; Attorney: ROSS, ROBERT M

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - MO: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 08/06/15: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Court Transfer; Parties Present Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A. AND SHIRLEY J. CUMMINGS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 1998; Defendant; Attorney: ROSS, ROBERT M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Settlement Conference Statement - Comment: Defendant's Settlement and Trial Setting Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Request for Entry of Default.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: David L. Siple.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: All Unknown Occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 8/6/15 Hearing Time: 1:30PM Department/Division: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CHRISTOPHER CUMMINGS, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A. AND SHIRLEY J. CUMMINGS REVOCABLE TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 1998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less