This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:48:15 (UTC).

CHRISTINA RENE BYRUM DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/02/2015 CHRISTINA RENE BYRUM DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4849

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BYRUM, WILLIAM W

Defendant

NE BYRUM DECEASED

Decedents

BYRUM, CHRISTINA RENE

BYRUM, CHRISTINA

BYRUM, CHRISTINA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, JOSHUA G

Attorney at DARLING & WILSON

Po Box 2411 / 1626 19Th St #23

Bakersfield, CA 93303

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined. NEW NOTE- 2. Need proof of mailing to Shelley Hurwitz per Request for Special Notice filed 02/26/18 and David D. Wade per Request for Special Notice filed 01/24/18.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Status report...returned via file & serve

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined.

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

11/15/2017 MO: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined.

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 03/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition for Probate of Will

Probate of Will 070215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued-Court Motion; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: BYRUM, WILLIAM W

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued-Court Motion; Comment: Tentative Ruling: READY FOR HEARING READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: BYRUM, WILLIAM W

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketJudgment and Order for Final Distribution - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order settling first and final account, directing final distribution, allowing creditor;s claim, and for allowing compensation for ordinary and extraordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined. NEW NOTE- 2. Need proof of mailing to Shelley Hurwitz per Request for Special Notice filed 02/26/18 and David D. Wade per Request for Special Notice filed 01/24/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Re Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Status report...returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Report concerning Alaska accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE- 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketHearing on Status Report PC 12200 - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: STATUS REPORT OF EXECUTOR (PROBATE CODE 12201(A))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice - Comment: Request for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Docket874W PMT: Probate New Suit - 1st Petition <$250,000 GC - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BYRUM, WILLIAM W (PE-1). Received from DARLING & WILSON, check no(s) 24224. Receipt #832150 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: RW NUMBER: 17174 DATE OF WILL: 10/16/14 NUMBER OF PAGES: NINE (9) PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: CONFIDENTIAL COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.