This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 09:44:58 (UTC).

CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC VS GEO SECURE SERVICES, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GEO SECURE SERVICES, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2357

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Defendants

GEO SECURE SERVICES LLC

THE GEO GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OTKUPMAN ROMAN

Defendant Attorney

RANEN JEFFREY S

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

09/12/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/08/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

09/08/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

09/13/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/27/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/27/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

10/20/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees

10/20/2022: Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees

Notice of Removal of Action

10/27/2022: Notice of Removal of Action

Ruling

11/02/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Removal of Action; Comment: Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court; Filed By: DEFENDANT - GEO SECURE SERVICES LLC|DEFENDANT - THE GEO GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees; Comment: ***PAID*** Answer to Complaint Filed 10/20/2022;$435; Filed By: DEFENDANT - THE GEO GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - GEO SECURE SERVICES LLC|DEFENDANT - THE GEO GROUP INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to The Geo Group, Inc., a Florida Corporation, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Geo Secure Services, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amended Notice; Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES ANDNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CRC RULE 3.110 ANDNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 12/27/2022Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division:17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CHRIS MAZZEI, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geo Secure Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANEN JEFFREY S