This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:44:22 (UTC).

CHONG VS PERKINS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 CHONG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PERKINS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0034

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHONG, LAURA

Defendants

PERKINS, JEFFREY

BOWDEN, BARBIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WU, STANLEY W

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Answer filed by Jeffrey Perkins and Barbie Bowden

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: CHONG, LAURA; PERKINS, JEFFREY; BOWDEN, BARBIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketStipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Answer filed by Jeffrey Perkins and Barbie Bowden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: Set for 8/20/2015 at 10:00 AM Dept A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Posting as to All Other Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Jeffrey Perkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Barbie Bowden

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CHONG, LAURA; Served: 07/19/2015; Served: 07/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 113 KERN STREET TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less