This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:04:16 (UTC).

CHONG VS HOUSTON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 CHONG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOUSTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0092

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHONG, LAURA

Defendants

HOUSTON, TOM

HOUSTON, MELINDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Plaintiff's Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: As to Tom Houston; Melinda Houston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: CHONG, LAURA; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 900 Alameda Street Maricopa, CA 93252; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: HOUSTON, TOM; HOUSTON, MELINDA; Party: Names: CHONG, LAURA; HOUSTON, TOM; HOUSTON, MELINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 900 Alameda Street Maricopa, CA 93252

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Tom Houston and Melinda Houston

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Tom Houston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Melinda Houston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CHONG, LAURA; Served: 09/27/2015; Served: 09/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 900 ALAMEDA STREET MARICOPA, CA 93252 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less