Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 08:59:43 (UTC).

CHO VS HA

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 CHO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2967

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHOI, IVA

CHO, YOUNG C

Defendants

CHUNG, JIN WON

HA, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHONG, EDWARD J

FLORENCE, BARRY G

Defendant Attorney

KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment / Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/10/2020; Served: 03/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Of transfer in from Los Angeles Superior Court Case 20STCV08485

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 12/11/2020 Notice of Outgoing transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 11/10/2020 Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 12/11/2020 Clerk's Certification of Reproduce Court Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 12/11/2020 Receipt for Transmitted Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 10/30/2020 Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 10/30/2020 Notice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 07/15/2020 Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 06/09/2020 Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 04/23/2020 Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 03/11/2020 Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 03/11/2020 Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 02/28/2020 Notice of Case Assigment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 02/28/2020 Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 02/28/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketRegister of Actions / Docket Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHONG, EDWARD J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORENCE BARRY G.