This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:06 (UTC).

CHEVRON VALLEY CREDIT UNION VS MAGALLANES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 CHEVRON VALLEY CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAGALLANES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0066

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEVRON VALLEY CREDIT UNION

Defendants

MAGALLANES, GERARDO G

ALANIS, VALERIE G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORMONDE, BRANDON M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding - Comment: AS TO GERARDO GUADALUPE MAGALLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding - Comment: AS TO VALERIE GUTIERREZ ALANIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO VALERIE G. ALANIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO GERARDO G. MAGALLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CHEVRON VALLEY CREDIT UNION; Served: 04/10/20176:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.