This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:52:43 (UTC).

CHERYL AND DUANE MOORE LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 CHERYL AND DUANE MOORE LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Wyatt, Ralph W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2200

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MOORE, CODY

LANE, SAMUEL

LANE, FORREST

Not Yet Classified

MOORE, CHERYL

MOORE, DUANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WRIGHT, LARRY L

 

Court Documents

Petition

PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WRIGHT, LARRY L; Petitioner; Attorney: WRIGHT, LARRY L; Petitioner; Attorney: WRIGHT, LARRY L

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Jayne E. Freadman and Jessica Pesina-Roberts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.; Comment: Order confirming trust assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WRIGHT, LARRY L; Petitioner; Attorney: WRIGHT, LARRY L; Petitioner; Attorney: WRIGHT, LARRY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 11/19/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Probate Documents - Requested By: LANE, FORREST, LANE, SAMUEL, MOORE, CODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for Order confirming existence of Trust, Successor Trustee and Trust assets (Probate code sections 850(a)(3), 17200(a))

    Read MoreRead Less