This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:56:11 (UTC).

CHB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC VS GUILLEN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2015 CHB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUILLEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0072

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendants

GUILLEN, KARLA

TORREZ, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: CHB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1400 Hood Street #64 Arvin, CA 93203; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: GUILLEN, KARLA; TORREZ, JUAN; Party: Names: CHB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC; GUILLEN, KARLA; TORREZ, JUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 1400 Hood Street #64 Arvin, CA 93203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Karla Guillen and Juan Torrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned VIA In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Personal Service as to Karla Guillen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to Juan Torrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CHB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC; Served: 09/27/2015; Served: 09/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1400 HOOD STREET, #64 ARVIN, CA 93203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less