This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 08:22:12 (UTC).

CHAWLA VS CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 CHAWLA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CASTLE COOKE CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0990

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NADJMABADI, ESMAIL

WERNER, MAGGIE

BURTON, JANELL

BURTON, JAMES

GREWAL, KAUR

KAUR, HARWINDER

KAUR, NARINDER

SINGH, JASVIR

PATEL, KALPNA

BARNES, BRADLEY

CHAWLA, ANUJ

GREWAL, JAGBIR

PATEL, BRIJIESH

THAKER, SNEHAL

BARNES, JULIA

WENER, JOSEPH

CERON, CARLOS

NADJMABADI, YULISSA

HILL, VICKI

Defendant

CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA, INC.

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INIGUEZ MIGUEL

Defendant Attorney

KING MICHAEL W

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/19/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Miguel Iniguez Re: Summons Reason: Summons must conform exact to complaint

Further Case Management Conference

10/14/2022: Further Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

08/30/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Further Case Management Conference

06/17/2022: Further Case Management Conference

Ruling

05/13/2022: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

03/02/2022: Further Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference

11/02/2021: Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

03/08/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Electronic Rejection Notice

03/04/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

02/23/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

02/10/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

02/10/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

01/06/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

11/30/2021: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees

09/07/2021: Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees

Cross Complaint

09/03/2021: Cross Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/03/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: with prejudice, Cross-Complaint filed by Castle & Cooke California, Inc. as to Reed Painting & Decorating, Inc. Only; Filed By: CROSS COMPLAINANT - CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to Cross-Defendant, Sonny's Drywall and Rosedale Ceramic Tile & Marble - ONLY - With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re: Request for Dismissal: 2nd Notice: The Cross-Defendant, Rosedale Ceramic Tile and Marble was Dismissed on 2/10/22. Please remove the party from the Request.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Audio streaming announced.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re: Request for Dismissal: ross-Defendant, Rosedale Ceramic Tile and Marble was Dismissed on 2/10/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Cross Complaint; Filed By: CROSS COMPLAINANT - CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Castle & Cooke California, Inc. via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BARNES, BRADLEY|PLAINTIFF - BARNES, JULIA|PLAINTIFF - BURTON, JAMES|PLAINTIFF - BURTON, JANELL|PLAINTIFF - CHAWLA, ANUJ|PLAINTIFF - GREWAL, JAGBIR|PLAINTIFF - GREWAL, KAUR|PLAINTIFF - HILL, VICKI|PLAINTIFF - KAUR, HARWINDER|PLAINTIFF - KAUR, NARINDER|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MONTECINO, CHRISTOPHER|PLAINTIFF - NADJMABADI, ESMAIL|PLAINTIFF - NADJMABADI, YULISSA|PLAINTIFF - PATEL, BRIJIESH|PLAINTIFF - PATEL, KALPNA|PLAINTIFF - SINGH, JASVIR|PLAINTIFF - THAKER, BHAGWATI|PLAINTIFF - THAKER, SNEHAL|PLAINTIFF - WENER, JOSEPH|PLAINTIFF - WERNER, MAGGIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Judge Barmann, Dept. 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CHAWLA, ANUJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/19/2021Hearing Time: 9:15AMHearing Department/Division:11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: To: Miguel IniguezRe: SummonsReason: Summons must conform exact to complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BARNES, BRADLEY|PLAINTIFF - BARNES, JULIA|PLAINTIFF - BURTON, JAMES|PLAINTIFF - BURTON, JANELL|PLAINTIFF - CERON, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - CHAWLA, ANUJ|PLAINTIFF - GREWAL, JAGBIR|PLAINTIFF - GREWAL, KAUR|PLAINTIFF - HILL, VICKI|PLAINTIFF - KAUR, HARWINDER|PLAINTIFF - KAUR, NARINDER|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MONTECINO, CHRISTOPHER|PLAINTIFF - NADJMABADI, ESMAIL|PLAINTIFF - NADJMABADI, YULISSA|PLAINTIFF - PATEL, BRIJIESH|PLAINTIFF - PATEL, KALPNA|PLAINTIFF - SINGH, JASVIR|PLAINTIFF - THAKER, BHAGWATI|PLAINTIFF - THAKER, SNEHAL|PLAINTIFF - WENER, JOSEPH|PLAINTIFF - WERNER, MAGGIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - BARNES, BRADLEY|PLAINTIFF - BARNES, JULIA|PLAINTIFF - BURTON, JAMES|PLAINTIFF - BURTON, JANELL|PLAINTIFF - CERON, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - CHAWLA, ANUJ|PLAINTIFF - GREWAL, JAGBIR|PLAINTIFF - GREWAL, KAUR|PLAINTIFF - HILL, VICKI|PLAINTIFF - KAUR, HARWINDER|PLAINTIFF - KAUR, NARINDER|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MONTECINO, CHRISTOPHER|PLAINTIFF - NADJMABADI, ESMAIL|PLAINTIFF - NADJMABADI, YULISSA|PLAINTIFF - PATEL, BRIJIESH|PLAINTIFF - PATEL, KALPNA|PLAINTIFF - SINGH, JASVIR|PLAINTIFF - THAKER, BHAGWATI|PLAINTIFF - THAKER, SNEHAL|PLAINTIFF - WENER, JOSEPH|PLAINTIFF - WERNER, MAGGIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING MICHAEL W