This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 23:24:24 (UTC).

CHAVEZ VS URRQUIETA

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 CHAVEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against URRQUIETA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1927

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHAVEZ, ELSA

Respondent

URRQUIETA, MICHEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Document Image; without prejudice , as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action (per judge judith k. dulcich) to dismiss divorce judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: Document Image; marital status ends: 12/05/14. per judge william p. lamb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image; FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image; FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less