This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 07:22:05 (UTC).

CHAVEZ VS PINE VALLEY PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 CHAVEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PINE VALLEY PROPERTY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1246

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAVEZ, ARTHUR

CHAVEZ, MARICELA

Defendants

PINE VALLEY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

TWIN OAKS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

TERRY PAGE SEPARATE PROPETY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN, TANNER R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/16/2021 Hearing Time: 8:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/16/2021 Hearing Time: 8:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIELSEN TANNER