This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/06/2020 at 06:06:48 (UTC).

CHAVEZ VS KOLT/KOLT

Case Summary

On 03/15/2006 CHAVEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOLT/KOLT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moench, Romero J and Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4810

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moench, Romero J

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBO PLUMBING

CHAVEZ, KARI

Defendants

KOLT, JOHN

KOLT, CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2009
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CHAVEZ KARI (PL-1). Received from ROBO PLUMBING, check no(s) 6988. Receipt #489331 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: KARI CHAVEZ RE: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT NO FILING FEE ENCLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • DocketJudgment / Statement of Decision - Comment: FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • DocketNP1810 - Comment: Department: AT Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL DE NOVO SMALL CLAIMS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KARI CHAVEZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JOHN KOLT (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY CHARLES KOLT PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: JIM HORN SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. PARTIES TO BE NOTIFIED OF DECISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • Docket4005 Trial De Novo - Small Claims - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: DEFENDANT APPEARED AT COUNTER, INFORMED OF TRIAL DE NOVO DATE OF 9-7-06.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: Edit Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Comment: FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2006
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • DocketNP1820 - Comment: Department: AT Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON MOTION OF JOHN KOLT (DE-2) CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 6/19/2006 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT A. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO COURT WHO SERVED: JOHN KOLT HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE DATE SERVED: 03/27/06 SERVICE FEES: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE INCOMPLETE AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN KOLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER WHO SERVED: CHARLES KOLT HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 03/27/06 SERVICE FEES: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: MAILED TO: PLAINTIFF RE: INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • Docket853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for CHAVEZ, KARI DBA ROBO PLUMBING (PL-1). Received from ROBO PLUMBING & SEPTIC SERVICE, check no(s) 3691. Receipt #231181 for amount of $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 459

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBO PLUMBING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant