This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 05:23:37 (UTC).

CHASE BANK USA VS CARRILLO

Case Summary

On 06/21/2010 CHASE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARRILLO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7682

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

CARRILLO, GENARO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER, ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Form - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=1291978 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:06/17/2011, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, Deputy:MARIANELAM, SystemDate:6/22/2010 8:25:59 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR:CHASE BANK USA N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST:GENARO CARRILLO PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $6575.17 PREJUGMENT INTEREST: $0 ATTORNEY FEES: $0 COSTS: $272.00 TOTAL: $6847.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1033 (B)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT CCP 585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO GENARO CARRILLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 - 5 INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE WAS FILED ~ calid=1291972 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:01/07/2011, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, Deputy:MARIANELAM, SystemDate:6/22/2010 8:22:57 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Proof of Service Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: AS TO GENARO CARRILLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LCOATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHO SERVED:GENARO CARRILLO HOW SERVED:SUBSTITUTION DATE SERVED:07/13/10 AND MAILING ON 07/14/10 SERVICE FEES: $67.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 17, 2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 17, 2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 07, 2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 07, 2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DATE PREVIOUSLY CALENDARED IS A HOLIDAY ~ calid=1291957 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:12/24/2010, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, Deputy:MARIANELAM, SystemDate:6/22/2010 8:14:57 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Docket843W Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $205.00 for CHASE BANK USA (PL-1). Received from LEGAL EXPRESS LTD, check no(s) 048880. Receipt #530462 for amount of $205.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 216

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bleier, Elizabeth A