This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:53:30 (UTC).

CHARLES BRUCE DAVID DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CHARLES BRUCE DAVID DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3031

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DAVID, TAYLOR

DAVID, JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WELLS, ANNA F

 

Court Documents

Petition to Determine Succession

Petition to Determine Succession 03/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WELLS, ANNA F; Petitioner; Attorney: WELLS, ANNA F

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • Order Determining Succession - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition to Determine Succession - Petition to Determine Succession 03/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WELLS, ANNA F; Petitioner; Attorney: WELLS, ANNA F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 3/9/17 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Last Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-16-001226;date of will 9/24/15; Seven (7) pages; stapled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Petition to Determine Succession - Comment: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition to Determine...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less