This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:54 (UTC).

CHAMBASIS VS ARANA

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CHAMBASIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0339

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHAMBASIS, ANA C. RIVERA

Respondent

ARANA, RIGOBERTO

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FL-630

Motion (DCSS)

12/04/2018 MO: MOTION (DCSS): Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: CHAMBASIS, ANA C. RIVERA; Respondent: ARANA, RIGOBERTO

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CHAMBASIS, ANA C. RIVERA; Respondent: ARANA, RIGOBERTO

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: CHAMBASIS, ANA C. RIVERA; Respondent: ARANA, RIGOBERTO

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PER COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order Existing With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.