This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 11:00:03 (UTC).

CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JP WORLD ENTERPRISES INC.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JP WORLD ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2505

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

JP WORLD ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERR LEONARD C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/26/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/29/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

09/29/2022: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/29/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

10/31/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

10/31/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Lis Pendens

11/04/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to JP WORLD ENTERPRISES INC, via subservice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: SUMMONS: Party names do not conform to Complaint. Court address needs to be corrected. Effective January 3, 2022 the Civil Department is located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301. Please correct and re-file into the existing case. CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET: Item 5 is incomplete. Court address needs to be corrected. Effective January 3, 2022 the Civil Department is located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301. Please correct and re-file into the existing case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 01/11/2023Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL VALLEY FOAM EXPERTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JP WORLD ENTERPRISES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Herr, Leonard C.