This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 08:23:17 (UTC).

CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC. VS BIOLOGIX LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIOLOGIX LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0761

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CHAVEZ, JACOB

BIOLOGIX LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX STEPHEN C.

Defendant Attorneys

BRAUN CRAIG D

DODGIN DUSTIN S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

10/04/2022: Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

09/27/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case(s)

09/20/2022: Notice of Related Case(s)

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/20/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

09/19/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/20/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Case Management Statement

09/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint

07/01/2022: Answer to Complaint

Ruling

06/30/2022: Ruling

Answer to Complaint

06/08/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Related Case(s)

04/18/2022: Notice of Related Case(s)

Order to Show Cause

04/07/2022: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

04/07/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

04/01/2022: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BIOLOGIX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CHAVEZ, JACOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: ON BEHALF OF BIOLOGIX LLC; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BIOLOGIX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Filed By: DEFENDANT - CHAVEZ, JACOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re: Notice of Related Case, per phone call request from filing party, filing is being rejected.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re: Notice of Related Case, item 1 a. and b. case title and case number do not conform.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CHAVEZ, JACOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BIOLOGIX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer of Biologix LLC to Unverified Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BIOLOGIX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CHAVEZ, JACOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Comment: BCV-20-102816; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/21/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 amHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CENTRAL CAL PROCESSING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIOLOGIX LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DODGIN DUSTIN S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN, CRAIG D