This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 14:41:08 (UTC).

CEJA VS GIL(E)

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 CEJA filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against GIL E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3687

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CEJA, ESMERALDA

Respondent

GIL, RODOLFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Respondent Attorney

HART, CARL W, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR **SERVICE ISSUES**; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/3/17 *ALSO ON RLM CAL IN DA CASE*; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/26/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent; Privately Retained: HART, CARL W, Jr.

Ruling

Ruling 01/11/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner: CEJA, ESMERALDA; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent; Privately Retained: HART, CARL W, Jr.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/26/17 1/10/18; Parties Present Petitioner: CEJA, ESMERALDA; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: GIL, RODOLFO; Privately Retained: HART, CARL W, Jr.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FOAH RET'D TO ATTY BIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FOAH RET'D TO ATTY BIN

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/14/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SENT VIA DCSS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice Regarding Payment of Support (Out) - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SENT VIA DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Petition for Custody and Support (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/14/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: HRG: 1/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: COURT REFERRAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/3/17 *ALSO ON RLM CAL IN DA CASE*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/28/17 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR **SERVICE ISSUES**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 10/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 10/03/17 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketPetition for Custody

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, XOCHITL M