This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 14:16:55 (UTC).

CAVAZOS VS SENA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 CAVAZOS filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against SENA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

Respondent

SENA, ANA MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Personal Service (CH-200); Filed By: PETITIONER - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Lamont Division B; Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Personal Service (CH-200); Comment: AS TO ANA MARIA SENA; Filed By: PETITIONER - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109); Filed By: PETITIONER - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100); Filed By: PETITIONER - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110); Filed By: PETITIONER - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PETITIONER - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less