This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:49:42 (UTC).

CAVANESS VS CAVANESS

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 CAVANESS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAVANESS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4713

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAVANESS, MATTHEW

Respondent

CAVANESS, GAYLA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 9/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Appearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: DIVORCE CITY 911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: DIVORCE CITY 911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: DIVORCE CITY 911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less