This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:26 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS YANEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YANEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5950

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

ERIC YANEZ AKA ERIC R YANEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURROWS, JASON M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to Eric Yanez aka Eric R Yanez. 2 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less