This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 19:59:40 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS SILVA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SILVA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0078

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

SILVA, OBDULIA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Ruling

03/09/2017 MO: Ruling on Hearing Date: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; SILVA, OBDULIA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear - Comment: Hearing regarding: Dismissal Hearing Date: 6/2/17 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 03/09/2017 MO: Ruling on Hearing Date: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Served: 04/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.