This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:52 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5760

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

CRESELDA PEREZ AKA CRESELDA A PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Judgment packet. Does not conform with CRC 2.100-2.119. Returned via e-file

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles, Returned via e-file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: cont'd from 09/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Awarded Against: CRESELDA PEREZ AKA CRESELDA A PEREZ; Amount; Damages: $3,133.34; Costs: $315.00; Total: $3448.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Creselda Perez aka Creselda A Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granting use of Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: in support of application for entry of judgment pursuant to civil code 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Judgment packet. Does not conform with CRC 2.100-2.119. Returned via e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO CRESELDA PEREZ , SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.