This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:41:18 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS MONTELONGO

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTELONGO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0068

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

MONTELONGO, ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Sacramento/Original returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Awarded Against: MONTELONGO, ELIZABETH; Amount; Damages: $6,018.08; Costs: $295.00; Total: $6313.08; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; MONTELONGO, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Regarding Original Documents and/or Lost Instrument and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Judgment (CCP 1033)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Elizabeth Montelongo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: Attempted to Serve Elizabeth Montelongo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Served: 10/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.