This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:26 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS MEDRANO

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEDRANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5789

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

MEDRANO, CHRISSTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL, MATTHEW W

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Awarded Against: MEDRANO, CHRISSTIAN; Amount; Damages: $831.81; Costs: $304.00; Total: $1135.81; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; MEDRANO, CHRISSTIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Cont'd from 10/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to CHRISSTIAN MEDRANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 1788.60a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Waiver of Security Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Waiver of Interest in Excess of 10%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to CHRISSTIAN MEDRANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): 1a does not conform to the Complaint. Returned via ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Chrisstian Medrano. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: REGARDING STATEMENT OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less