This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:02 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS MCARTHUR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCARTHUR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1798

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendants

MCARTHUR, STACIE

MCARTHUR, GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISOS, ALEXA A.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Costs

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: ABSTRACT - INCOMPLETE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Kern, Returned via e-file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: ABSTRACT - INCOMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Awarded Against: MCARTHUR, STACIE; MCARTHUR, GEORGE; Amount; Damages: $1,469.00; Costs: $383.00; Total: $1852.00; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; MCARTHUR, STACIE; MCARTHUR, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO STACIE MCARTHUR AND GEORGE MCARTHUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO GEORGE MCARTHUR, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO STACIE MCARTHUR, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/23/2017; Served: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less