This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:23 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV, I LLC VS MANZANO

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CAVALRY SPV, I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANZANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5788

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV, I LLC

Defendant

MANZANO, DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISOS, ALEXA A.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 04/26/17

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: cont'd from 6/28/17 and 04/26/17 plaintiff counsel to file dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 04/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Declaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: As to Debra Manzano. 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less