This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 09:42:41 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 12/23/2015 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R. and Staley, H.A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0134

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

GONZALEZ, RIGOBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTERSON, ERIN E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

MO - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(D): Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE:Proof of Service; Parties Present Plaintiff: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Attorney: PATTERSON, ERIN E

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Awarded Against: GONZALEZ, RIGOBERTO; Amount; Damages: $1,376.19; Costs: $294.50; Total: $1670.69; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; GONZALEZ, RIGOBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: As To Rigoberto Gonzalez Total: $1670.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Electronic Document(s) - Comment: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Statement - Comment: STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Request for Clerk's Judgment - Comment: As To Rigoberto Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service As To Rigoberto Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - MO - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(D): Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE:Proof of Service; Parties Present Plaintiff: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Attorney: PATTERSON, ERIN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: Attempted to Serve Rigoberto Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less