This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 19:31:03 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, VS CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4471

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

CHAVEZ, ARMANDO G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAERO, INGRID V.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request & Dismissal rejected -Does not conform to CRC 2.104 Font too small and not legible Poor Image quality

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request & Dismissal rejected -Does not conform to CRC 2.104 Font too small and not legible Poor Image quality

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAERO INGRID V.