This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:48 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS BURKS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BURKS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5759

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

BURKS, BRAYTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAR, RANJEET K

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 04/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 3 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 3 ATTEMPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.