Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 19:30:20 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK VS HARP AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARP AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0104

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

HARP AN INDIVIDUAL, JARED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER I.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK; Awarded Against: HARP AN INDIVIDUAL, JARED; Amount; Damages: $4,607.91; Costs: $245.00; Total: $4852.91; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK; HARP AN INDIVIDUAL, JARED; CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: RE: COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/27/202010:41 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER