This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:18:41 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS UCLARAY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UCLARAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

UCLARAY, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA, GRACE G.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Mary Uclaray; 7 attempts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Mary Uclaray, 9 attemps.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.