This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:41 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS TERRAZAS

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERRAZAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1522

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

TERRAZAS, JESSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Awarded Against: TERRAZAS, JESSE; Amount; Damages: $5,048.29; Costs: $300.00; Total: $5348.29; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; TERRAZAS, JESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO JESSE TERRAZAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to JESSE TERRAZAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JESSE TERRAZAS, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.