This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 09:58:55 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Fka Ge Capital Retail Bank, VS SANDRA ESCOBAR AKA SANDRA J ESCOBAR

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Fka Ge Capital Retail Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDRA ESCOBAR AKA SANDRA J ESCOBAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0094

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Fka Ge Capital Retail Bank,

Defendants

Sandra Escobar Aka Sandra J Escobar,

SANDRA ESCOBAR AKA SANDRA J ESCOBAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAN, CHERRIE Y.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/18/20203:02 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Sandra Escobar AKA Sandra J. Escobar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.